Ex-Faculty Members |
||||||
SN |
Name |
Designation |
Period | Present Contact Detail | ||
From | To | |||||
8 | Dr. Anup Paul | Assistant Professor (Ad-Hoc) | 01-05-2015 | Jan-2016 | Department of ME, NIT, Itanagar. | |
7 | Dr. Sachin Kumar Singh | Assistant Professor | 29-07-2010 | 10-02-2015 | Department of ME, ISM, Dhanbad. | |
6 | Dr. Vivek Kumar Mehta | Assistant Professor (Ad-Hoc) | 31-07-2013 | 30-06-2014 | ||
5 | Dr. Ashis Mallick | Associate Professor | 30-08-2011 | 06-06-2013 | Department of ME, ISM, Dhanbad. | |
4 | Prof. Parimal Bakul Barua | Professor | December 2010 | 25-06-2011 | Department of ME, JEC, Jorhat | |
3 | Prof. Shyamanta M. Hazarika | Professor | 27-09-2010 | 17-05-2012 | Department of ME, IIT, Guwahati | |
2 | Dr. Ranjan Das | Assistant Professor | 16-06-2010 | 31-12-2011 | Department of ME, IIT,Ropar | |
1 | Ms. Monikangkana Sharma | Assistant Professor | July-2007 | 02-08-2008 |
Ex-Staff Members |
||||||
SN |
Name |
Designation |
Period | Present Contact Detail | ||
From | To | |||||